Singh v. CRST Expedited Inc et al

Plaintiff: Surrinder Singh
Defendant: Andrew P Walker, Pine Hills Trucking Inc, Pamela Krause and CRST Expedited Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00134
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: U.S. (County Unknown)
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Pine Hills Trucking Inc,. (Barnett, Monty)
September 19, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 10:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf)
September 12, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by CRST Expedited Inc filed in state court July 18, 2018 (Court Staff, scat)
September 12, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Andrew P Walker Filed in state court August 15, 2018. (Court Staff, scat)
September 12, 2018 Filing 22 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET filed in state court on 5/14/2018. (Court Staff, scat)
September 6, 2018 Filing 21 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Smith, Loyd)
August 30, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by CRST Expedited Inc,. (Smith, Loyd)
August 27, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for James C Murnion. Receipt CHY029403. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Andrew P Walker, Pine Hills Trucking Inc, CRST Expedited Inc, Pamela Krause by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(cc: Second Judicial District via USPS)(Court Staff, stbd)
August 24, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed on July 13, 2018 by Surrinder Singh. (Shaffer, Ryan) Modified on 8/29/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed on July 9, 2018 by Surrinder Singh. (Shaffer, Ryan) Modified on 8/29/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed on July 9, 2018 by Surrinder Singh. (Shaffer, Ryan) Modified text on 8/29/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
August 24, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed on June 26, 2018 by Surrinder Singh. (Shaffer, Ryan) Modified on 8/29/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of complexity by Defendants CRST Expedited Inc, Andrew P Walker ; this case is non-complex. (Smith, Loyd)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 REMOVED FILED IN ERROR SUMMONS Returned Executed by Surrinder Singh. All Defendants (Shaffer, Ryan) Modified on 8/24/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of complexity by Defendants Pamela Krause, Pine Hills Trucking Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Barnett, Monty)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Pine Hills Trucking Inc, Pamela Krause. (Barnett, Monty)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting James Murnion for Surrinder Singh by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for James C. Murnion to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Surrinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of James Murnion in Support of Motion to Appear PHV, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stepans, Robert)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 DISREGARD INCORRECT FILING - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Surrinder Singh (Shaffer, Ryan) Modified on 8/23/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan R Shaffer on behalf of Surrinder Singh (Shaffer, Ryan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Leonard Stepans on behalf of Surrinder Singh (Stepans, Robert)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Defendants Pamela Krause, Pine Hills Trucking Inc of Consent to Removal (Barnett, Monty)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monty L Barnett on behalf of Pamela Krause, Pine Hills Trucking Inc (Barnett, Monty)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JOINDER in #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Carbon County Wyoming, 18-88. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by CRST Expedited Inc, by Defendant Andrew P Walker (Smith, Loyd) Modified on 8/23/2018 (Court Staff, sth).
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 State COMPLAINT filed in Second Judicial District Carbon County Wyoming, filed by Surrinder Singh. (Court Staff, sth)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Carbon County Wyoming, 18-88. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by CRST Expedited Inc. (Attachments: # 1 state complaint, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 consent) (Court Staff, sth) Modified on 8/23/2018 (Court Staff, sth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. CRST Expedited Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew P Walker
Represented By: Loyd E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Hills Trucking Inc
Represented By: Loyd E Smith
Represented By: Monty L Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Krause
Represented By: Loyd E Smith
Represented By: Monty L Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Expedited Inc
Represented By: Loyd E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surrinder Singh
Represented By: Robert Leonard Stepans
Represented By: Ryan R Shaffer
Represented By: James Murnion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?