Lundahl et al v. McKay Dee Hospital et al

Plaintiff: Marti Lundahl and Holli Lundahl
Defendant: McKay Dee Hospital and IC System Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00138
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
2 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Holli Lundahl, Marti Lundahl (Court Staff, scat) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/4/2018) (Court Staff, scat).
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 DISREGARD DUPLICATE FILING Proposed Order on #5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Attached Proposed order to Motion filed by Defendant McKay Dee Hospital. (Christensen, Peter) Modified text on 8/30/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to Utah filed by Defendant McKay Dee Hospital. (Christensen, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, scat).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McKay Dee Hospital, IC System Inc by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(cc: Pro Se Plaintiff and 8th Judicial District via USPS)(Court Staff, stbd)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Alan B Johnson recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott W Skavdahl for all further proceedings by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiffs)(Court Staff, ssw)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed on 8/3/18, filed by Marti Lundahl, Holli Lundahl. (Court Staff, ssw)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District - Niobrara County, CV-616. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt CHY029382), filed by McKay Dee Hospital, IC System Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, ssw) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/24/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundahl et al v. McKay Dee Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKay Dee Hospital
Represented By: Peter H Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IC System Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marti Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holli Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?