Sullivan v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: Susan W Sullivan
Defendant: George R Harris and Adamson Geittman PC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00141
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith M Fleischman on behalf of Susan W Sullivan (Fleischman, Keith)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Complaint with Response Due 10/29/2018 filed by Adamson Geittman PC. (Olson, Anna)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anna Marie Reeves Olson on behalf of Adamson Geittman PC (Olson, Anna)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George R Harris. George R Harris 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018 (Court Staff, scat)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P Klosterman on behalf of George R Harris (Court Staff, scat)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott E Ortiz on behalf of George R Harris (Ortiz, Scott)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca A Lewis on behalf of Susan W Sullivan. (Court Staff, ssw)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (2 summonses issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029384.), filed by Susan W Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, ssw) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/27/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan W Sullivan
Represented By: Rebecca A Lewis
Represented By: Keith M Fleischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George R Harris
Represented By: Scott P Klosterman
Represented By: Scott E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adamson Geittman PC
Represented By: Anna Marie Reeves Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?