Kenney v. United States of America
Petitioner: Angela D Kenney
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00153
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Angela Kenney re #3 Order. (Copy of Order re-mailed to petitioner with corrected USM number) (Court Staff, ssw)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Respondent United States of America. (Kubichek, David)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Service of Complaint by Clerk of Court and Requiring Response by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. The Government may file a response within 21 days after being served with Petitioner's motion. Petitioner may file a reply to the Government's response within 21 days after being served with the response. (Copy of order mailed to Petitioner)(Court Staff, ssw)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Kubichek on behalf of United States of America (Kubichek, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Angela D Kenney. (Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 10/12/2018 (Court Staff, sth). (Numbered Page 9 is missing from the original filing)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenney v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy J Forwood
Represented By: David A Kubichek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angela D Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?