Lambert et al v. Habila et al

Plaintiff: Garold Lambert and GDL Transport LLC
Defendant: Aymen Habila and MS Brother Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00157
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant MS Brother Group LLC ; this case is non-complex. (Lacock, Traci)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by MS Brother Group LLC. (Lacock, Traci)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. MS Brother Group LLC answer due 11/20/2018. (Court Staff, sjgc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Traci L Lacock on behalf of MS Brother Group LLC (Lacock, Traci)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (2 summonses issued; Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029561) filed by Garold Lambert, GDL Transport LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope, #4 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert et al v. Habila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aymen Habila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Brother Group LLC
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garold Lambert
Represented By: Robert E Schroth, Sr
Represented By: Robert E Schroth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GDL Transport LLC
Represented By: Robert E Schroth, Sr
Represented By: Robert E Schroth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?