Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc v. Ipe Woods USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc
Defendant: Steven Rossi and Ipe Woods USA LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00163
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Defendants' Counterclaims is extended up to and including December 3, 2018. (Court Staff, sjh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Friedman, Jennifer)
November 20, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi, Counter Claimants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Lain, Dallas)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended up to and including November 20, 2018. (Court Staff, sjh)
November 16, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response deadline filed by Defendants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lain, Dallas)
November 9, 2018 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Ipe Woods USA LLC,. (Lain, Dallas)
November 9, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand,, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc by Steven Rossi, Ipe Woods USA LLC. (Lain, Dallas)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Ipe Woods USA, LLC and Steven Rossi's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended up to and including November 16, 2018. (Court Staff, stbd)
November 9, 2018 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of Time for Defendant to Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lain, Dallas)
November 6, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing on #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 01:00 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. (Court Staff, stbd)
November 6, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl: Scheduling Conference held on 11/6/2018. Hearing on #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction reset for 12/6/2018 at 1:00 PM. (Court Reporter Anne Bowline.) (Court Staff, stbd)
November 2, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Robert Griffin. Receipt CHY029780. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 21 Affidavit in OPPOSITION to #16 Motion to Continue (Dispositive), filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-web results, #2 Exhibit B-web results, #3 Exhibit C-web results, #4 Exhibit D-web results) (Friedman, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #16 Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction previously set for November 6, 2018 at 9:00 AM is VACATED. Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2018 09:00 AM in Judge Skavdahl's chambers before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Scheduling conference is a telephonic hearing dialing instructions contained in the Order. (Court Staff, scat) Modified text on 11/2/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
November 2, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #19 MOTION for Order Appearance by Telephone (Court Staff, szf)
November 2, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Appearance by Telephone filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Matthew) Modified on 11/2/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Robert Griffin for Ipe Woods USA LLC and Steven Rossi by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
November 1, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Robert C Griffin to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Lain, Dallas)
November 1, 2018 Filing 16 First MOTION to Continue (Dispositive). Requesting continuance of Hearing on Preliminary Injuction filed by Defendants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Lain, Dallas) (Main Document 16 replaced with letter size document on 11/2/2018) (Court Staff, stbd).
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dallas J Lain on behalf of Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi (Lain, Dallas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 at 09:00 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. (Court Staff, skb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Affidavit, #6 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Matthew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Kaufman, Matthew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi, filed by Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Court Staff, szf)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. Ipe Woods USA LLC served on 10/9/2018, answer due on 10/30/2018 (Kaufman, Matthew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. Steven Rossi served on 10/9/2018, answer due on 10/30/2018 (Kaufman, Matthew)
October 4, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Jennifer L Friedman. Receipt CHY029640. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Jennifer L. Friedman for Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jennifer L. Friedman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, ssw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Praecipe for Summonses filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc, 2 issued. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D Kaufman on behalf of Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc (Court Staff, ssw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (2 summonses issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029639.), filed by Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc v. Ipe Woods USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rossi
Represented By: Robert C Griffin
Represented By: Dallas J Lain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipe Woods USA LLC
Represented By: Robert C Griffin
Represented By: Dallas J Lain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Kaufman
Represented By: Jennifer L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?