Wells v. United States of America
Petitioner: Timothy Michael Wells
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00165
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to #6 Response to Motion filed by Petitioner Timothy Michael Wells. (Court Staff, ssw) Original document did not contain a page 19 when we received it in the mail(Court Staff, ssw).
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Timothy Wells regarding mailing response. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Respondent United States of America. (Szott, Thomas)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Service of Complaint by Clerk of Court and Requiring Response by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Paper copy sent to AUSA and sent via NEF, copy also mailed to peitioner)(Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 10/5/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for the Appointment of Counsel filed by Petitioner Timothy Michael Wells. (Court Staff, szf)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed with Exception to Local Court Rule 72.2(b) which Authorizes the Magistrate to Oversee Petitioner's Post-Conviction Proceedings filed by Petitioner Timothy Michael Wells. (Court Staff, szf)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Supporting Declaration filed by Petitioner Timothy Michael Wells. (Court Staff, szf)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Timothy Michael Wells. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Mr. Wells, #2 Proposed Order Requiring Service and Response) (Court Staff, szf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Szott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Michael Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?