Total Home Exteriors Inc v. James

Appellant: Total Home Exteriors Inc
Appellee: George Russell James
Case Number: 2:2018cv00168
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: Wyoming District Court
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 9 APPENDIX re #6 Brief, #8 Appendix, #7 Appendix Volume III filed by Appellant Total Home Exteriors Inc. (Brady, Patrick)
November 21, 2018 8 APPENDIX re #6 Brief, #7 Appendix Volume II filed by Appellant Total Home Exteriors Inc. (Brady, Patrick)
November 21, 2018 7 APPENDIX re #6 Brief Volume I filed by Appellant Total Home Exteriors Inc. (Brady, Patrick)
November 21, 2018 6 Appellant BRIEF filed by Appellant Total Home Exteriors Inc. (Brady, Patrick)
October 26, 2018 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Court Staff, ssw)
October 24, 2018 4 Statement of Issues on Appeal by, Appellee George Russell James re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Court Staff, stbd)
October 24, 2018 3 DESIGNATION of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Appellee George Russell James, re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Court Staff, stbd)
October 19, 2018 2 DESIGNATION of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Appellant Total Home Exteriors Inc re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Part 1-5, #2 Part 6, #3 Part 7, #4 Part 8, #5 Part 9, #6 Part 10, #7 Part 11, #8 Part 12) (Court Staff, stbd)
October 5, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-20349, Adversary Proceeding Number 17-02019, filed by Total Home Exteriors Inc. (Court Staff, szf) Modified on 10/5/2018 (Court Staff, sth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Home Exteriors Inc v. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Total Home Exteriors Inc
Represented By: Jane Marie France
Represented By: Patrick Michael Brady
Represented By: Raymond W Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: George Russell James
Represented By: Paul G Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?