Richard Kaumo et al v. Sweetwater County School District No 1 et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Kaumo and Richard Kaumo
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 1 Teacher, Sweetwater County School District No 1, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Director of Special Education, Sweetwater County School District No 1 School Counselor and Sweetwater County School District No 1 Principal
Case Number: 2:2018cv00172
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Defendants Sweetwater County School District No 1, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Director of Special Education, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Principal, Sweetwater County School District No 1 School Counselor, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Teacher ; this case is non-complex. (Stubson, Timothy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Sweetwater County School District No 1 Teacher, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Director of Special Education, Sweetwater County School District No 1 School Counselor, Sweetwater County School District No 1, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Principal. (Stubson, Timothy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kaumo, Danielle Kaumo. Sweetwater County School District No 1 served on 11/5/2018, answer due on 11/26/2018; Sweetwater County School District No 1 Director of Special Education served on 11/5/2018, answer due on 11/26/2018; Sweetwater County School District No 1 Principal served on 11/5/2018, answer due on 11/26/2018; Sweetwater County School District No 1 School Counselor served on 11/5/2018, answer due on 11/26/2018; Sweetwater County School District No 1 Teacher served on 11/5/2018, answer due on 11/26/2018 (Court Staff, sth) Modified on 11/15/2018 (Court Staff, sth).(Filed as non public due to minor name on document)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (five summonses issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY29734.), filed by Richard Kaumo, Danielle Kaumo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/22/2018) (Court Staff, sjlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Kaumo et al v. Sweetwater County School District No 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Kaumo
Represented By: Michael W Stulken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kaumo
Represented By: Michael W Stulken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 1 Teacher
Represented By: Timothy Michael Stubson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 1
Represented By: Timothy Michael Stubson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 1 Director of Special Education
Represented By: Timothy Michael Stubson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 1 School Counselor
Represented By: Timothy Michael Stubson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 1 Principal
Represented By: Timothy Michael Stubson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?