Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Bochmann et al

Plaintiff: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Teresa Gorzalka, Kenneth Gorzalka, Randy Bochmann (dba) and Randy Bochmann
Case Number: 2:2018cv00177
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 DUPLICATION TO #12 - DISREGARD WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randy Bochmann. (Healy, Ryan) Modified on 11/30/2018 (Court Staff, sal).
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randy Bochmann (dba). Randy Bochmann (dba) 10/26/2018, answer due 1/23/2019; Randy Bochmann 10/26/2018, answer due 1/23/2019 (Healy, Ryan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Teresa Gorzalka 11/19/2018, answer due 1/23/2019 (Amatuzio, Kevin)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Kenneth Gorzalka 11/19/2018, answer due 1/23/2019 (Amatuzio, Kevin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Healy on behalf of Randy Bochmann and Bochmann Construction. (Healy, Ryan) Modified on 11/20/2018 (Court Staff, sal).
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. On November 16, 2018, the Court held an informal conference regarding the parties' request that the Court mediate this case prior to Defendants filing an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Because the parties have agreed to attend mediation, the Court concludes, by agreement of all parties, that Defendants are not required to submit their Answer until January 23, 2019, if mediation does not settle the case. (Court Staff, sjh)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Settlement Conference by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Settlement Conference set for 1/16/2019 08:30 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 106) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin.(Court Staff, szf)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Codie D Henderson on behalf of Kenneth Gorzalka, Teresa Gorzalka (Henderson, Codie)
November 5, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Kevin F Amatuzio. Receipt CHY029796. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Kevin F Amatuzio for Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company (Court Staff, szf)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kevin F. Amatuzio to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Amatuzio, Kevin)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company (Court Staff, sbh)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company: this case is non-complex (Court Staff, sbh)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief filed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company (4 summonses issued) (Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029746) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Cover Letter, #10 Mailing Label) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2018: #11 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh). Modified by adding Consent Form to entry on 10/26/2018 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Bochmann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Gorzalka
Represented By: Codie D Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Gorzalka
Represented By: Codie D Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Bochmann (dba)
Represented By: Ryan P Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Bochmann
Represented By: Ryan P Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lori K Bell
Represented By: Kevin F Amatuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?