Flowers v. Terracon Consultants Inc

Plaintiff: Kent Flowers
Defendant: Terracon Consultants Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00187
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Benjamin J. Rowland for Terracon Consultants Inc. Attorney Benjamin N. Reiter terminated. (Court Staff, sjh)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to #9 Response filed by Defendant Terracon Consultants Inc. (Esch, Amanda) Modified on 1/3/2019 (Court Staff, sal).
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Defendant Terracon Consultants Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Permitting Substitution of Counsel)(Esch, Amanda)
December 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 12/27/2018 (Court Staff, sal).
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 OPPOSITION to #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Kent Flowers. (Asay, Bruce) Modified security and text on 12/27/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Terracon Consultants Inc. (Esch, Amanda)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Terracon Consultants Inc. (Esch, Amanda)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Defendant Terracon Consultants Inc. (Esch, Amanda). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 12/27/2018 (Court Staff, sal).
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin N Reiter on behalf of Terracon Consultants Inc (Reiter, Benjamin)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda F Esch on behalf of Terracon Consultants Inc (Esch, Amanda)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kent Flowers. Terracon Consultants Inc served on 11/20/2018, answer due on 12/11/2018 (Asay, Bruce)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Kent Flowers, one issued. (Court Staff, szf)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (one summons issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029829), filed by Kent Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, szf) Modified text on 11/9/2018 (Court Staff, szf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Terracon Consultants Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Flowers
Represented By: Gregory Bruce Asay
Represented By: Bruce S Asay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terracon Consultants Inc
Represented By: Amanda F Esch
Represented By: Benjamin N Reiter
Represented By: Benjamin J Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?