Mortensen v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Brandon Mortensen
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00190
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Alan B Johnson for all further proceedings as Presiding Judge and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin as Referral Judge by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjlg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent /Request for Reassignment (Goman, Keith) Modified on 12/11/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company, identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Goman, Keith) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Goman, Keith)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Coby Cohen on behalf of Brandon Mortensen (Cohen, Coby)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Mortensen. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 11/15/2018, answer due on 12/6/2018 (Jubin, Thomas)
November 13, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Coby Cohen. Receipt CHY029858. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Coby Cohen added as counsel for Plaintiff Brandon Mortensen (Court Staff, szf)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Coby Cohen to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Brandon Mortensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, szf)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas B. Jubin on behalf of Brandon Mortensen (Court Staff, szf)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (one summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029858), filed by Brandon Mortensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ) (Court Staff, szf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortensen v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Keith M Goman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Mortensen
Represented By: Coby Cohen
Represented By: Thomas B Jubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?