Lambert et al v. West Coast Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sandra L Lambert and George L Thompson
Defendant: West Coast Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00203
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. The Court, having reviewed and considered the Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the above-captioned matter is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with each Party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendant West Coast Life Insurance Company is discharged from any and all further liability whatsoever arising under or relating in any way to West Coast Life Insurance Company No. ZUA338546 and West Coast Life Insurance Company Policy No. ZUA346298.(Court Staff, szf)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Sandra L Lambert, George L Thompson pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Booke, Bradley) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has up to an including January 11, 2019, to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Court Staff, sjh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Date to Answer Complaint filed by Defendant West Coast Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to extend date to answer complaint)(Lubing, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James K Lubing on behalf of West Coast Life Insurance Company (Lubing, James)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029957.), filed by Sandra L Lambert, George L Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert et al v. West Coast Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James K Lubing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra L Lambert
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L Thompson
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?