Staples v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Gene L Staples
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00219
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Trent R Church. Receipt CHY030331. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Trent R Church for BNSF Railway Company (Court Staff, sal)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Trent R Church to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Knight, Chad)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe LLC and Berkshire Hathaway Inc for BNSF Railway Company. (Knight, Chad) Modified on 1/17/2019 (Court Staff, sal).
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company. (Knight, Chad)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad M Knight on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Knight, Chad)
December 27, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for James K Vucinovich. Receipt CHY030082. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #3 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting James K Vucinovich for Gene L Staples (Court Staff, sbh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene L Staples: BNSF Railway Company served on 12/27/2018, answer due on 1/17/2019 (Court Staff, sbh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for James K. Vucinovich to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Gene L Staples. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, sbh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas B Jubin on behalf of Gene L Staples (Court Staff, sal)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) - receipt #CHY030050) filed by Gene L Staples. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staples v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Trent R Church
Represented By: Chad M Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene L Staples
Represented By: Thomas B Jubin
Represented By: James K Vucinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?