Phillips & Jordan v. Erosion Control Applications Inc

Plaintiff: Phillips & Jordan
Defendant: Erosion Control Applications Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00006
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
0 Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
1 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against defendant, Eroision Control Applications, Inc. by the Clerk of Court, Stephan Harris. (Court Staff, sal)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case reassigned to Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal assigned as presiding judge for all further proceedings. The Honorable Kelly H. Rankin reassigned from presiding judge to referral judge. Please use case number 19-CV-06-F for all future case filings.(Court Staff, szf)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default against Erosion Control Applications Inc filed by Plaintiff Phillips & Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coppede, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillips & Jordan. Erosion Control Applications Inc served on 1/17/2019, answer due on 2/7/2019 (Coppede, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Phillips & Jordan, one issued. (Court Staff, szf)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (one summons issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY030171.), filed by Phillips & Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Assignment to USMJ) (Court Staff, szf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips & Jordan v. Erosion Control Applications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillips & Jordan
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erosion Control Applications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?