Hale v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Plaintiff: Amil Hale
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00009
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal as Presiding Judge and the Honorable Mark L Carman as Referral Judge for all further proceedings by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjlg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation, identifying Corporate Parent Schlumberger Holdings Corporation for Schlumberger Technology Corporation.. (Scott, Stephen)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Scott, Stephen)
February 21, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Stephen Scott and Allison Fish. Receipt CHY030419. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #5 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Allison Fish for Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Ms. Fish is in good standing with the Louisiana State Bar. (Court Staff, sea)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Stephen Scott for Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Mr. Scott is in good standing with the Alabama State Bar. (Court Staff, sea) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/22/2019) (Court Staff, sea).
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Allison Fish to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Jubin, Thomas) Modified on 2/21/2019 (Court Staff, sal).
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Stephen Scott to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Jubin, Thomas) Modified on 2/21/2019 (Court Staff, sal).
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman. Schlumberger Technology Corporation answer due 2/26/2019 (Court Staff, sea)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas B Jubin on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation (Court Staff, sbh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Amil Hale (1 summons issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY030193) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Represented By: Allison A Fish
Represented By: Thomas B Jubin
Represented By: Stephen L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amil Hale
Represented By: Gregory Bruce Asay
Represented By: Bruce S Asay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?