Brown v. Asselin et al

Plaintiff: Terry Brown
Defendant: Stuart Asselin and Richard Coleman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00014
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 26, 2019. (Court Staff, sjh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Stuart Asselin, Richard Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lyttle, Aaron)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas N Long on behalf of Stuart Asselin, Richard Coleman (Long, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron John Lyttle on behalf of Stuart Asselin, Richard Coleman (Lyttle, Aaron)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Brown. Stuart Asselin served on 2/7/2019, answer due on 2/28/2019 (Sutphin, Isaac)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Brown. Richard Coleman served on 2/5/2019, answer due on 2/26/2019 (Sutphin, Isaac)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Terry Brown, two (2) issued. (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Pope on behalf of Terry Brown (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Nathan Sutphin on behalf of Terry Brown (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (two summonses issued) (Filing fee $400 receipt #Chy30216), filed by Terry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Asselin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Brown
Represented By: Isaac Nathan Sutphin
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Asselin
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Aaron John Lyttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Coleman
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Aaron John Lyttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?