Campbell County Hospital District v. Lantz-Boggio Architects PC

Plaintiff: Campbell County Hospital District
Defendant: Lantz-Boggio Architects PC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00015
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF re #24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Counter Defendant Campbell County Hospital District. (Gilbertz, Jay)
March 14, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Counter Claimant Lantz-Boggio Architects PC (Taravella, Christopher) Modified filers/text on 3/15/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
March 1, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of #24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Counter Defendant Campbell County Hospital District. (Gilbertz, Jay)
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss #22 Amended Counterclaim filed by Counter Defendant Campbell County Hospital District. (Gilbertz, Jay) Created link on 3/4/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Counter Claimants Lantz-Boggio Architects PC, Lantz-Boggio Architects PC, Defendant Lantz-Boggio Architects PC. (Taravella, Christopher)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Campbell County Hospital District by Lantz-Boggio Architects PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Claim) (Taravella, Christopher)
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Campbell County Hospital District. Lantz-Boggio Architects PC served on 2/5/2019, answer due on 2/26/2019 (Gilbertz, Jay)
February 12, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #19 Response to Motion filed by Plaintiff Campbell County Hospital District (Gilbertz, Jay) Modified link on 2/13/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Lantz-Boggio Architects PC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chris Thomas, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Chris Thomas, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Chris Thomas, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Chris Thomas) (Taravella, Christopher) Modified link, text/filers on 2/11/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of #17 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Counter Defendant Campbell County Hospital District (Gilbertz, Jay) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Counter Defendant Campbell County Hospital District (Gilbertz, Jay) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Notice of Assignment, #4 Summons, #5 Notice of Removal to the Court and documents, #6 Notice of Removal to the Plaintiff) (Taravella, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Campbell County Hospital District (1 issued) (Court Staff, sbh)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Campbell County Hospital District by Lantz-Boggio Architects PC. (Taravella, Christopher)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas E Lubnau, II on behalf of Campbell County Hospital District (Lubnau, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Complexity by Plaintiff Campbell County Hospital District: this case is complex (Gilbertz, Jay)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's BRIEF in support of #9 Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Campbell County Hospital District. (Gilbertz, Jay) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Campbell County Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Fitzgerald Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Crichton Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Crichton Affidavit)(Gilbertz, Jay)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tom C Toner on behalf of Campbell County Hospital District (Toner, Tom)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay A Gilbertz on behalf of Campbell County Hospital District (Gilbertz, Jay)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson regarding #1 Notice of Removal filed by Lantz-Boggio Architects PC (Certified copy of order mailed to state court on this date) (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Lantz-Boggio Architects PC (no parent corporation) (Court Staff, sbh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher A Taravella on behalf of Lantz-Boggio Architects PC (Court Staff, sbh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant Lantz-Boggio Architects PC (Court Staff, sbh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed 12/20/2018 by Campbell County Hospital District (Court Staff, sbh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Lantz-Boggio Architects PC from Sixth District Court, Campbell County, 38187 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #CHY030217) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Mailing Label, #4 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell County Hospital District v. Lantz-Boggio Architects PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campbell County Hospital District
Represented By: Jay A Gilbertz
Represented By: Thomas E Lubnau, II
Represented By: Tom C Toner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lantz-Boggio Architects PC
Represented By: Christopher A Taravella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?