Kirscher v. Wagner
Plaintiff: Abbe Kirscher
Defendant: Cody Wagner
3Rd Party Defendant: Brendan O'Keeffe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00037
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 Praecipe for Summons for Brendan O'Keeffe filed by Counter Claimant Cody Wagner, Third-Party Plaintiff Cody Wagner, Defendant Cody Wagner (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Tangeman, Jason) 1 summons issued on 4/12/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim by Abbe Kirscher (Robinson, John) Modified text on 4/1/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Praecipe for Summons for Brendan O'Keeffe filed by Third-Party Plaintiff Cody Wagner (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Tangeman, Jason) Summons issued and mailed to counsel on 2/22/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendant Brendan O'Keeffe, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Abbe Kirscher by Cody Wagner. (Tangeman, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL filed by Cody Wagner by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Copy of the Order mailed to the Ninth Judicial District, Teton County on this date. (Court Staff, sjlg) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in Ninth Judicial District Teton County Case 17888, filed by Abbe Kirscher. (Court Staff, sth) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District Teton County, 17888. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by Cody Wagner. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2019: #4 proposed consent) (Court Staff, sth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirscher v. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbe Kirscher
Represented By: John H Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Wagner
Represented By: Jason Tangeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Brendan O'Keeffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?