Abdul Rahman Bin Soufayan v. AlSouad
Plaintiff: Adel Bin Abdul Rahman Bin Soufayan
Defendant: Sarah AlSouad
Case Number: 2:2019cv00096
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin denying #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides that a plaintiff has ninety days to serve a complaint. Plaintiff therefore has ninety days from May 14, 2019, the date he filed his Complaint, to serve Defendant. Because Plaintiff has ample time to serve Defendant within the 90-day period proscribed by Rule 4, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of time as moot. If the 90-day deadline approaches and Plaintiff remains unable to serve Defendant, Plaintiff may file a motion that requests additional time and shows good cause for the extension. (Court Staff, sjh) Copy of order to Plaintiff via US Mail on 7/9/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant filed by Plaintiff Adel Bin Abdul Rahman Bin Soufayan. (Court Staff, szf)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by Plaintiff Adel Bin Abdul Rahman Bin Soufayan (Court Staff, ssw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY030919.), filed by Adel Bin Abdul Rahman Bin Soufayan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Court Staff, ssw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #4 Consent Form) (Court Staff, ssw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdul Rahman Bin Soufayan v. AlSouad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah AlSouad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adel Bin Abdul Rahman Bin Soufayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?