Cloud Peak Energy Inc et al v. United States Department of Interior et al

Petitioner: National Mining Association, Cloud Peak Energy Inc, Wyoming Mining Association, The Wilderness Society, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Western Organization of Resource Counsel and Powder River Basin Resource Counsel
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, Gregory Gould, David Bernhardt and Office of Natural Resources Revenue
Not Yet Classified: State of California and State of New Mexico
Consolidated Petitioner: Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc, American Petroleum Institute, Western Fuels-Wyoming Inc and Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Amicus Curiae: Independent Petroleum Association of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00120
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re (28 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) MOTION to Intervene filed by Shannon Anderson, attorney Shannon Anderson appearing for Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization o filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Jaffe, Rebecca)
August 7, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Rosario C Doriott Dominguez. Receipt CHY031406. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Karl Obrecht on behalf of Independent Petroleum Association of America Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Obrecht, Alexander)
August 6, 2019 Filing 47 Amicus Curiae BRIEF In Support of Petitioners' Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction re (23 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) Memorandum in Support of Motion, (22 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amicus Independent Petroleum Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Leggette, Lyle)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (33) Motion to Intervene in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (23) Motion to Intervene in case 2:19-cv-00121-SWS; granting (22) Motion to Intervene in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS. State of California and State of New Mexico added as Intervenor Respondents.Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (43) Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (33) Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in case 2:19-cv-00121-SWS; granting (32) Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS. IPAA may file its proposed amicus brief, including any exhibits or other attachments thereto, previously attached as Exhibit 1 to the motion.Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (42) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Rosario C Doriott Dominguez for Independent Petroleum Association of America in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf) Modified document link on 8/7/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
August 2, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by AUGUST 2, 2019 (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of deadline filed by Independent Petroleum Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amicus Curiae Brief iso Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Naatz Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Milito Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Leggette, Lyle) Modified filer on 8/5/2019 (Court Staff, scat). Modified text on 8/7/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
August 2, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Independent Petroleum Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Leggette, Lyle) Modified filer on 8/5/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
August 2, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lyle Poe Leggette on behalf of Indepandant Petroleum Association of America Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Leggette, Lyle) Modified filer on 8/5/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (24), (26), (27) Motions to appear pro hac vice admitting John Everett,George Torgun,David A Zonana for State of California in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (25) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting William G Grantham for State of New Mexico in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)
July 31, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for David A. Zonana to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed) Modified on 8/6/2019 to terminate motion Order entered on 7/31/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for George Torgun to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed) Modified on 8/6/2019 to terminate motion Order entered on 7/31/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for William G. Grantham to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed) Modified to terminate motion order entered on 7/31/2019 on 8/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John W. Everett to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed) Modified to term motion on 8/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support of (33 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) Motion to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Respondents State of California, State of New Mexico. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Zars, Reed)
July 31, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene by states of California and New Mexico filed by Reed Zars filed by Intervenor Respondents State of California, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed)
July 31, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reed Zars on behalf of State of California, State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Zars, Reed)
July 29, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Aaron Colangelo. Receipt CHY031340. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjk)
July 29, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Cecilia D Segal. Receipt CHY031343. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjk)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #29 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Cecilia D Segal for Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Counsel and granting #30 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Aaron Colangelo for Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource CounselAssociated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, sal)
July 25, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, Western Organization of Resource Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Aaron Colangelo, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Anderson, Shannon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Cecilia Segal to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Cecilia Segal)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Anderson, Shannon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by Shannon Anderson, attorney Shannon Anderson appearing for Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Counsel, filed by Movants Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit NRDC declaration, #2 Affidavit TWS declaration, #3 Affidavit WORC-PRBRC-NPRC declaration, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Anderson, Shannon)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents may respond to Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #22 on or before August 16, 2019. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Preliminary Injunction Motion Response Deadline filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Jaffe, Rebecca)
July 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing on (22 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (11 in 2:19-cv-00126-SWS) Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 01:30 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, scat)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #21 Motion to Consolidate Cases Pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is ordered that all future pleadings should only be filed in the lead case number 19-CV-120-SWS. (Court Staff, sjlg) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner Cloud Peak Energy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Eggers, Walter)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner Cloud Peak Energy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eggers, Walter)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Consolidation Pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Petitioners Cloud Peak Energy Inc, National Mining Association, Wyoming Mining Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eggers, Walter) Modified motion relief on 7/19/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Rebecca J. Jaffe for Respondents by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Vassallo, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc. Gregory Gould served on 6/24/2019, answer due on 8/23/2019. Served through the Honorable Gregory Gould, Director of Office of Natural Resources Revenue. (Eggers, Walter) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc. Office of Natural Resources Revenue served on 6/24/2019, answer due on 8/23/2019. Served through the Office of Natural Resources Revenue. (Eggers, Walter)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rebecca Jaffe to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondent United States Department of Interior. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of United States Department of Interior (Vassallo, Nicholas)
June 21, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: DISREGARD. (Court Staff, sjk).
June 21, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice payments for James M Auslander and Peter J Schaumberg. Receipt CHY031150. (Court Staff, sjk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #12 , #13 Motions to appear pro hac vice admitting James M Auslander and Peter J Schaumberg for National Mining Association, Wyoming Mining Association (Court Staff, sbh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Peter J. Schaumberg to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioners National Mining Association, Wyoming Mining Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A-Affidavit of Peter Schaumberg, #2 Proposed Order)(Burron, Keith)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for James M. Auslander to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioners National Mining Association, Wyoming Mining Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A-Affidavit of James Auslander, #2 Proposed Order)(Burron, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting John F Shepherd and #10 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Kristina R. Van Bockern for Cloud Peak Energy Inc (Court Staff, scat) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
June 17, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Kristina R Van Bockern. Receipt CHY031121. (Court Staff, sjk)
June 17, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for John F Shepherd. Receipt CHY031120. (Court Staff, sjk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kristina R. Van Bockern to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioner Cloud Peak Energy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Eggers, Walter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John F. Shepherd to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioner Cloud Peak Energy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Eggers, Walter)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc. United States Attorneys Officer served on 6/14/2019, answer due on 8/13/2019. Served through the United States Attorney- District of Wyoming. (Eggers, Walter) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Praecipe for Summons filed by Petitioner Cloud Peak Energy Inc, six issued. (Court Staff, szf)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Wyoming Mining Association. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by National Mining Association. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Frederick Eggers, III on behalf of Cloud Peak Energy Inc (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Burron on behalf of National Mining Association, Wyoming Mining Association (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW ( Filing fee $400 receipt #Chy31075.), filed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc, National Mining Association, Wyoming Mining Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloud Peak Energy Inc et al v. United States Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Gould
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Natural Resources Revenue
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Mining Association
Represented By: Keith Burron
Represented By: James M Auslander
Represented By: Peter J Schaumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cloud Peak Energy Inc
Represented By: Walter Frederick Eggers, III
Represented By: Kristina R. Van Bockern
Represented By: John F Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wyoming Mining Association
Represented By: Keith Burron
Represented By: James M Auslander
Represented By: Peter J Schaumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northern Plains Resource Counsel
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Organization of Resource Counsel
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Powder River Basin Resource Counsel
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of California
Represented By: George Torgun
Represented By: Reed Zars
Represented By: David A Zonana
Represented By: John Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Reed Zars
Represented By: William G Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc
Represented By: Gail L Wurtzler
Represented By: Kathleen C Schroder
Represented By: R Kirk Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Keith Burron
Represented By: James M Auslander
Represented By: Peter J Schaumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Western Fuels-Wyoming Inc
Represented By: Brian D Artery
Represented By: Rex Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Represented By: Brian D Artery
Represented By: Rex Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Independent Petroleum Association of America
Represented By: Rosario C Doriott Dominguez
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?