WY GP Retail LLC v. Jackson WY
Plaintiff: WY GP Retail LLC
Defendant: Jackson WY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00129
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff WY GP Retail LLC (Trefonas, Elisabeth)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 on or before August 5, 2019. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 on or before August 12, 2019. (Court Staff, sjh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Filing Answer and/or Filing Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Jackson WY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Thompson on behalf of Jackson WY (Thompson, Thomas)
June 19, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Gary S Edinger. Receipt CHY031127. (Court Staff, sjk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #5 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Gary S Edinger for WY GP Retail LLC (Court Staff, sal)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Gary S Edinger to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff WY GP Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, sjlg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Oral Hearing on #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff WY GP Retail LLC. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff WY GP Retail LLC. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff WY GP Retail LLC. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Damages (one summons issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #Chy031126), filed by WY GP Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WY GP Retail LLC v. Jackson WY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WY GP Retail LLC
Represented By: Gary S Edinger
Represented By: Elisabeth Michael Wagner Trefonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson WY
Represented By: Thomas A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?