Cox v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: William J Cox
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2019cv00139
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Defendant Social Security Administration Commissioner (1 disc received on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 9/20/2019 (Court Staff, ssw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William J Cox. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/22/2019, answer due on 9/20/2019 (Merritt, Hannalore) Modified on 7/31/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
July 19, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hav vice fee for Hannalore B Merritt. Receipt CHY031308. (Court Staff, sjk)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #3 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Hannalore B Merritt for William J Cox (Court Staff, sbh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Hannalore B. Merritt to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff William J Cox. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Crocker, Berthenia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff William J Cox (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, sbh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Judicial Review filed by William J Cox (3 summonses issued) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Cox
Represented By: Berthenia S Crocker
Represented By: Hannalore B Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?