Western Watersheds Project et al v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Deputy Secretary, United States Department of Interior Secretary, David Bernhardt, United States Department of the Interior Bureau of Land Management and Ryan Zinke
Intervenor Defendant: Western Energy Alliance, State of Wyoming and Jonah Energy LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00146
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Kathleen C Schroder. Receipt CHY031521. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 27, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Gail L Wurtzler. Receipt CHY031520. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #9 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. Defendant-Intervenor Western Energy Alliance is withdrawn from this matter. (Court Staff, scat)
August 16, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #9 MOTION for Order Permission to Withdraw (Court Staff, szf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Permission to Withdraw filed by Intervenor Defendant Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sparks, William) Modified on 8/19/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William E Sparks on behalf of Western Energy Alliance (Sparks, William)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice admitting Gail L Wurtzler and Kathleen C Schroder for Jonah Energy LLC (Court Staff, sbh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Kirk Mueller on behalf of Jonah Energy LLC (Mueller, R)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kathleen C. Schroder; Gail L. Wurtzler to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Defendant Jonah Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Gail L. Wurtzler, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Kathleen C. Schroder)(Mueller, R) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/15/2019) (Court Staff, sbh).
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter(s) from Clerk of Court to Counsel in this case regarding potential conflict. (Court Staff, scat)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Docket sheet from case in the District of Idaho (1:18-cv-00187-REB). (Court Staff, sal)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER filed in the District of Idaho.(Court Staff, sal)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE from the District of Idaho that case has been transferred to the District of Wyoming. (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project et al v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Deputy Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: William E Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Michael M Robinson
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Jonah Energy LLC
Represented By: Gail L Wurtzler
Represented By: Kathleen C Schroder
Represented By: R Kirk Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?