Delong v. SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marci Delong
Defendant: SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC and SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00149
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record from Laramie County Clerk of District Court, Diane Sanchez. (Court Staff, sal)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting in part #12 Request for Evideniary Hearing subject to the pending Stay of the Lawsuit. Upon conclusion of arbitration, the parties shall file a joint Status Report advising the Court as to whether there are any remaining issues subject to limited discovery on personal jurisdiction or an evidentiary hearing. (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 9/5/2019 (Court Staff, sth).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #11 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Lawsuit. This case is stayed pending the outcome of arbitration.(Court Staff, sal)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, Request for Evidentiary Hearing filed by Defendants SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC. (Jones, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Lawsuit filed by Defendants SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Jones, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until August 21, 2019, to file replies in support of their Motion to Compel Arbitration #11 and Motion to Dismiss #12 . (Court Staff, sjh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Replies in Support of Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendants SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Lawsuit filed by Plaintiff Marci DeLong. (Rhodes, Diana)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Marci DeLong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order) (Rhodes, Diana)
July 24, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Lawsuit (Court Staff, szf)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-SavaSeniorCare, LLC Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B-SSC Equity Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C-Ownership Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D-Farrington Order, #5 Proposed Order)(Jones, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Lawsuit filed by Defendants SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Dispute Resolution Agt, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Claim, #3 Exhibit C-GR Response to Claim, #4 Exhibit D-Kindred Order, #5 Exhibit E-Wyo. SC Order, #6 Proposed Order)(Jones, Christopher) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/25/2019) (Court Staff, ssw). Modified on 7/25/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by SSC Equity Holdings LLC,. (Jones, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by SavaSeniorCare LLC,. (Jones, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC,. (Jones, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC,. (Jones, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC,. (Jones, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Jones, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Jones, Christopher)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal filed by SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Certified copy of Order mailed to Laramie County District Court on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed in State of Wyoming, First Judicial District Court, Laramie County (Civil Doc. No. 191-734) by Plaintiff Marci DeLong (Court Staff, sal) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Wyoming, First Judicial District Court, Laramie County, 191-734. (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt CHY031287) filed by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC, SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delong v. SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Represented By: Thomas B Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Represented By: Thomas B Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Equity Holdings LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Represented By: Thomas B Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Represented By: Thomas B Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Jones
Represented By: Thomas B Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marci Delong
Represented By: Diana Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?