Fisher et al v. Mulligan
Plaintiff: Jill Fisher
Defendant: Matthew D Mulligan
In Re: Financial Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00154
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 Motion to Stay Case, Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Matthew D Mulligan. (Garrett, Tyler)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to stay case , MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by Defendant Matthew D Mulligan. (Garrett, Tyler)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D Kaufman on behalf of Matthew D Mulligan (Kaufman, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler John Garrett on behalf of Matthew D Mulligan (Garrett, Tyler)
September 5, 2019 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Nicholas M DeWeese, $ 100, receipt number 1089-1649400 re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Fetter, Kellie)
September 5, 2019 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of James G Sawtelle, $ 100, receipt number 1089-1649399 re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Fetter, Kellie)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice of James G Sawtelle and Nicholas M DeWeese as Counsel for Plaintiff by the Honorable Mark L Carman granting #3 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting James G Sawtelle,Nicholas M DeWeese for Jill Fisher; granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting James G Sawtelle,Nicholas M DeWeese for Jill Fisher (Court Staff, ska)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Nicholas M. DeWeese to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Jill Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Nicholas M. DeWeese, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fetter, Kellie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for James G. Sawtelle to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Jill Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of James G. Sawtelle, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fetter, Kellie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jill Fisher. Matthew D Mulligan 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019 (Fetter, Kellie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISSOLUTION AND WINDING UP filed by Jill Fisher (1 summons issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY031322) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Re-Organization Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amendment to Re-Organization Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #4 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher et al v. Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Fisher
Represented By: Kellie Nelson Fetter
Represented By: Nicholas M DeWeese
Represented By: James G Sawtelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D Mulligan
Represented By: Matthew D Kaufman
Represented By: Tyler John Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Financial Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?