Eagle Bear et al v. Harvey MD et al
Plaintiff: Debra Eagle Bear and Willard V Eagle Bear
Defendant: Barbara Blankenship MD, Banner Health, Envision Healthcare Corporation, Michael G Myers MD and Eric Trefelner MD Inc, Imaging Advantage LLC and Carrie Harvey MD
Case Number: 2:2019cv00163
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Alan B Johnson
2 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Traci L Van Pelt on behalf of Envision Healthcare Corporation, Carrie Harvey MD, Imaging Advantage LLC, Michael G Myers MD and Eric Trefelner MD Inc (Van Pelt, Traci)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Envision Healthcare Corporation, Imaging Advantage LLC, Michael G Myers MD and Eric Trefelner MD Inc,. (Van Pelt, Traci)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Imaging Advantage LLC, Carrie Harvey MD, Envision Healthcare Corporation, Michael G Myers MD and Eric Trefelner MD Inc. (Van Pelt, Traci)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Banner Health. (Ortiz, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, with 12 Person Jury Demand by Barbara Blankenship MD. (Hunkins-Newton, Amanda) Modified on 9/20/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Hunkins-Newton on behalf of Barbara Blankenship MD (Hunkins-Newton, Amanda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Debra Eagle Bear, Willard V Eagle Bear. Envision Healthcare Corporation served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Carrie Harvey MD served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Imaging Advantage LLC served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Michael G Myers MD and Eric Trefelner MD Inc served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Neville, Jason)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Debra Eagle Bear, Willard V Eagle Bear. Barbara Blankenship MD served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Neville, Jason)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Debra Eagle Bear, Willard V Eagle Bear, 7 issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RECUSING MAGISTRATE JUDGE by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. All non-dispositve matters will be heard by the Honorable Mark L Carman. (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiffs Willard V Eagle Bear, Debra Eagle Bear (Court Staff, sbh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Willard V Eagle Bear, Debra Eagle Bear (no summons(es) issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY031411) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #5 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle Bear et al v. Harvey MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Blankenship MD
Represented By: Amanda Hunkins-Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Health
Represented By: Scott E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envision Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Traci L Van Pelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G Myers MD and Eric Trefelner MD Inc
Represented By: Traci L Van Pelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imaging Advantage LLC
Represented By: Traci L Van Pelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Harvey MD
Represented By: Traci L Van Pelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Eagle Bear
Represented By: George Bryan Ulmer, III
Represented By: Jason Anthony Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willard V Eagle Bear
Represented By: George Bryan Ulmer, III
Represented By: Jason Anthony Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?