Owenby v. EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC
Plaintiff: Emmett Owenby and Emmett Owenby (Ind)
Defendant: EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC and Leonor Lowe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00170
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerome Mark Reinan on behalf of Emmett Owenby, Emmett Owenby (Ind) (Reinan, Jerome)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #5 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. #7 Motion for Hearing is denied as moot. The present action is stayed pending binding arbitration in accordance with the terms of the parties' arbitration agreement.(Court Staff, sal)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Emmett Owenby, Emmett Owenby (Ind), 1 issued (Court Staff, sbh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Emmett Owenby (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Rhodes, Diana)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Emmett Owenby, Emmett Owenby (Ind) against Defendant EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC, Leonor Lowe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Court Staff, sbh)
September 5, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice for Michael J Estok. Receipt CHY031569. (Court Staff, sjk)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #8 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Michael J Estok for EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC (Court Staff, sal)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael J. Estok to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Defendant EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hunkins-Newton, Amanda)
August 30, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #7 REQUEST for Hearing re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (Court Staff, szf)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. REQUEST for Hearing re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hunkins-Newton, Amanda) Modified on 9/3/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC,. (Hunkins-Newton, Amanda)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H. Rankin. MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Hunkins-Newton, Amanda) Modified on 9/3/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Hunkins-Newton on behalf of EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC (Hunkins-Newton, Amanda)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emmett Owenby. EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC served on 8/15/2019, answer due on 9/5/2019 (Rhodes, Diana)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Emmett Owenby, 1 issued (Court Staff, sbh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Emmett Owenby (1 summons issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY031454) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owenby v. EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EmpRes at Cheyenne LLC
Represented By: Amanda Hunkins-Newton
Represented By: Michael J Estok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonor Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Owenby
Represented By: Traci Sampson Rivinus
Represented By: Diana Rhodes
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Owenby (Ind)
Represented By: Traci Sampson Rivinus
Represented By: Diana Rhodes
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?