Gifford et al v. Victory 1 Roofing and Construction et al
Plaintiff: Chad Gifford and Heather Gifford
Defendant: Victory 1 Roofing and Construction and Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv00176
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 9:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Counterclaim by Chad Gifford, Heather Gifford. (Johnson, Jason)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Chad Gifford, Heather Gifford, filed by Victory 1 Roofing and Construction. (Court Staff, sth)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 State Court SUMMONS Returned Executed on 7/30/19 by Chad Gifford, Heather Gifford. Victory 1 Roofing and Construction served on 7/26/2019, answer due on 8/16/2019; Wells Fargo Bank National Association served on 7/25/2019, answer due on 8/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, ssw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Court Staff, ssw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Victory 1 Roofing and Construction,. (Brady, Patrick)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant Victory 1 Roofing and Construction. (Brady, Patrick)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Victory 1 Roofing and Construction. (Brady, Patrick)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Paul Kapp on behalf of Victory 1 Roofing and Construction (Kapp, Craig)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Michael Brady on behalf of Victory 1 Roofing and Construction (Brady, Patrick)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association, identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank National Association.. (DeWald, JoAnna)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (DeWald, JoAnna)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson regarding #1 Notice of Removal (Court Staff, sbh) Modified on 8/30/2019 (Court Staff, sth). Certified copy to Laramie County District Court sent via US Mail mailed on 08/30/19.
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed on 7/19/19, by Chad Gifford, Heather Gifford. (Court Staff, ssw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Judicial District - Laramie County, 191-850. (Filing fee $ 400, CHY031497), filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent) (Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 8/23/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gifford et al v. Victory 1 Roofing and Construction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Gifford
Represented By: Jason Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Gifford
Represented By: Jason Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory 1 Roofing and Construction
Represented By: Craig Paul Kapp
Represented By: Patrick Michael Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Represented By: Bradley T Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?