American Certified Brands LLC v. Jennings
Plaintiff: American Certified Brands LLC
Defendant: Robert W Jennings
Case Number: 2:2019cv00179
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Certified Brands LLC. Robert W Jennings served on 10/15/2019, answer due on 11/5/2019 (Olsen, Jared)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Robert W Jennings. (Boldt, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Subpoena by Plaintiff American Certified Brands LLC upon David Pope on 09/12/2019. (Olsen, Jared)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Subpoena by Plaintiff American Certified Brands LLC upon AgCert, LLC on 09/12/2019. (Olsen, Jared)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Subpoena by Plaintiff American Certified Brands LLC upon FirstTier on 09/13/2019. (Olsen, Jared)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Praecipe for Alias Summons filed by Plaintiff American Certified Brands LLC, 1 issued. (Court Staff, sal)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Robert W Jennings with Jury Demand filed by American Certified Brands LLC. (Court Staff, sal)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff American Certified Brands LLC Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Pope) (Olsen, Jared)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff American Certified Brands LLC Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum (FirsTier) (Olsen, Jared)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 First NOTICE by Plaintiff American Certified Brands LLC Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Pope) (Olsen, Jared)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 First SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Certified Brands LLC. Robert W Jennings served on 9/3/2019, answer due on 9/24/2019 (Olsen, Jared)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff American Certified Brands LLC, 1 issued. (Court Staff, sth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons(es) issued) with Jury ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY031537.), filed by American Certified Brands LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 consent) (Court Staff, sth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Certified Brands LLC v. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Certified Brands LLC
Represented By: Jared S Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Jennings
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Boldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?