Bextel v. Bryner et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Bextel
Defendant: Law Offices of M Candice Bryner, Charles Richards and M Candice Bryner
Case Number: 2:2019cv00204
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Bill of Costs)(Court Staff, ssw)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting #4 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. (Court Staff, ssw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defendants M Candice Bryner, Law Offices of M Candice Bryner, Charles Richards. (Chicken, Brent)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed in State Court on 8/26/2019 by Plaintiff Jonathan Bextel (Court Staff, sbh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 Motion to Withdraw Arguments in the pending Motion to Dismiss #4 . Defendants' Arguments for insufficient service of process and lack of personal jurisdiction are hereby withdrawn. Defendants' argument for failure to state a claim still remains. (Court Staff, sem)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Bextel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Vacating Domesticated Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - LACSC ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3 - LACSCs Order Dismissing Case, #4 Cited Authorities pursuant to Judge's Procedures 7(H), #5 Proposed Order) (Thomas, Richard)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order to Withdraw Defendants Arguments for Dismissal for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Bextel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Richard) Modified on 10/28/2019 (Court Staff, sal).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 10/25/2019. (Court Staff, sbh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Jonathan Bextel on behalf of All Defendants (Thomas, Richard) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Bextel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Richard)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Chicken, Brent)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Law Offices of M Candice Bryner: No parent corporation (Chicken, Brent) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants M Candice Bryner, Law Offices of M Candice Bryner, Charles Richards. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Non-Reported Cited Authority, #2 Proposed Order Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) (Chicken, Brent)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants M Candice Bryner, Law Offices of M Candice Bryner, Charles Richards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chicken, Brent)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corrected Exhibit re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants M Candice Bryner, Law Offices of M Candice Bryner, Charles Richards (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit A to Defendants Notice of Removal) (Chicken, Brent) Link added on 10/7/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Jonathan Bextel in the 9th Judicial District, Teton County on 8/26/2019. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2019: #1 Complaint - All pages included) (Court Staff, ssw).
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial District, Teton County, #18065. (Filing fee $ 400 paid receipt No CHY031753), filed by Charles Richards, Law Offices of M Candice Bryner, M Candice Bryner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bextel v. Bryner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Bextel
Represented By: Vonde M Smith
Represented By: Richard Ray Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of M Candice Bryner
Represented By: Brent D Chicken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Richards
Represented By: Brent D Chicken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Candice Bryner
Represented By: Brent D Chicken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?