Wyo-Ben Inc v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Plaintiff: Wyo-Ben Inc
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, David Bernhardt and William P Pendley
Case Number: 2:2019cv00215
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until December 26, 2019, to Respond to Plaintiff's pending Motion to Dismiss #9 .(Court Staff, sem) Modified text on 11/8/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion filed by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Vassallo, Nicholas)
October 25, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Robert R Marsh and William R Marsh. Receipt CHY031896. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Robert R. Marsh and William R. Marsh for Wyo-Ben Inc by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Wyo-Ben Inc. (Jarosh, Robert)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Wyo-Ben Inc. (Jarosh, Robert)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for William R. Marsh to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Wyo-Ben Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jarosh, Robert)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Robert R. Marsh to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Wyo-Ben Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jarosh, Robert)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Wyo-Ben Inc: no parent entities (Court Staff, sbh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Wyo-Ben Inc: this case is non-complex (Court Staff, sbh
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shaina A Case on behalf of Wyo-Ben Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Carl Jarosh on behalf of Wyo-Ben Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for summonses filed by Plaintiff Wyo-Ben Inc, 2 issued (Court Staff, sbh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wyo-Ben Inc (2 summonses issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY031842) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyo-Ben Inc v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management Acting Director
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Pendley
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyo-Ben Inc
Represented By: Robert Carl Jarosh
Represented By: Shaina A Case
Represented By: Robert R Marsh
Represented By: William R Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?