Martinez et al v. Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Stickelman, Daylen Vallejo, Alonso Martinez, Phillip Christiansen, Kyle R McCurley, Timothy McMaster and Dennis Omanoff
Defendant: Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc, Insperity People Services LP and Joseph Sery
Case Number: 2:2019cv00256
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of complexity by Defendants Insperity People Services LP, Joseph Sery, Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Good, Amanda)
January 31, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc: no corporate parent (Good, Amanda) Modified on 2/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Insperity People Services LP (Good, Amanda) Corporate Parent Insperity Inc added on 2/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant All Plaintiffs by Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc, Joseph Sery. (Good, Amanda)
January 31, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Insperity People Services LP. (Good, Amanda)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Crystal Dawn Stewart on behalf of Joseph Sery, Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc (Stewart, Crystal)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Elizabeth Berry on behalf of Insperity People Services LP, Joseph Sery, Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc (Berry, Erin)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Marie Good on behalf of Insperity People Services LP, Joseph Sery, Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc (Good, Amanda)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. In accordance with Local Rule 6.1(b), the Court grants Defendants an additional fourteen-day extension to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The answer or response is now due on January 31, 2020. (Court Staff, sem)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline to Answer Complaint and file counter and/or cross-claims filed by Defendants Joseph Sery, Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension)(Goetz, Megan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 DISREGARD. Duplicate entry. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Overmann Goetz on behalf of Joseph Sery, Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc (Goetz, Megan) Modified on 2/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Overmann Goetz on behalf of Joseph Sery, Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc (Goetz, Megan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin.In accordance with Local Rule 6.1(b), the Court grants Defendants an additional seven-days to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Court Staff, sem)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle R McCurley, Phillip Christiansen, Alonso Martinez, Timothy McMaster, Dennis Omanoff, Kyle Stickelman, Daylen Vallejo. Joseph Sery served on 12/20/2019, answer due on 1/10/2020 (Hayes, Megan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle R McCurley, Phillip Christiansen, Alonso Martinez, Timothy McMaster, Dennis Omanoff, Kyle Stickelman, Daylen Vallejo. Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc served on 12/20/2019, answer due on 1/10/2020. (Court Staff, sbh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle R McCurley, Phillip Christiansen, Alonso Martinez, Timothy McMaster, Dennis Omanoff, Kyle Stickelman, Daylen Vallejo. Insperity People Services LP served on 12/20/2019, answer due on 1/10/2020. (Court Staff, sbh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons for Tungsten Parts Wyo. filed by Plaintiff Alonso Martinez (Hayes, Megan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kyle R McCurley, Phillip Christiansen, Alonso Martinez, Timothy McMaster, Dennis Omanoff, Kyle Stickelman, Daylen Vallejo (summons(es) issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY032199) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Stickelman
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daylen Vallejo
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonso Martinez
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Christiansen
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle R McCurley
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy McMaster
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Omanoff
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc
Represented By: Crystal Dawn Stewart
Represented By: Amanda Marie Good
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Berry
Represented By: Megan Overmann Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insperity People Services LP
Represented By: Amanda Marie Good
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Sery
Represented By: Crystal Dawn Stewart
Represented By: Amanda Marie Good
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Berry
Represented By: Megan Overmann Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?