LafargeHolcim Ltd v Carbon GeoCycle Inc
Plaintiff: LafargeHolcim Ltd
Defendant: Carbon GeoCycle Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00265
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have up to and including March 16, 2020 to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. (Court Staff, sjgc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Answer Deadline filed by Defendant Carbon GeoCycle Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Matthew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Finding good cause, the Court grants the Motion. Defendants have until February 13, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Court Staff, sem)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan A Nicholas on behalf of Carbon GeoCycle Inc (Nicholas, Nathan)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline for Defendant to File an Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Carbon GeoCycle Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Matthew)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D Kaufman on behalf of Carbon GeoCycle Inc (Kaufman, Matthew)
January 9, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Jennifer Insley-Pruitt and Christopher S Ruhland. Receipt CHY032319. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 and #8 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Jennifer Insley-Pruitt and Christopher Ruhland for LafargeHolcim Ltd by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Christopher S. Ruhland to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff LafargeHolcim Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mincer, Richard)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jennifer Insley-Pruitt to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff LafargeHolcim Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mincer, Richard)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LafargeHolcim Ltd. Carbon GeoCycle Inc served on 12/23/2019, answer due on 1/13/2020 (Mincer, Richard)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard A Mincer on behalf of LafargeHolcim Ltd (Mincer, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff LafargeHolcim Ltd, one (1) issued. (Court Staff, sjlg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff LafargeHolcim Ltd ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, sjlg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Elizabeth Berry on behalf of LafargeHolcim Ltd (Court Staff, sjlg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (one summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY32221), filed by LafargeHolcim Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LafargeHolcim Ltd v Carbon GeoCycle Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon GeoCycle Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Kaufman
Represented By: Nathan A Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LafargeHolcim Ltd
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Berry
Represented By: Richard A Mincer
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Pruitt
Represented By: Christopher Ruhland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?