JMK 3 LLC v. The Geneus Group LLC
Plaintiff: JMK 3 LLC
Defendant: The Geneus Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00001
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Plaintiff JMK 3 LLC (Sweat, Bradley)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #18 Motion to Compel. (Court Staff, smh)
April 13, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiff JMK 3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweat, Bradley)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Kelly H Rankin: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/24/2021. (Court Reporter Jan Davis.) (Court Staff, sal)
February 11, 2021 Filing 16 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: BY TELEPHONE -All parties shall appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call: Toll Free 1-888-398-2342| Access code 3107456. | Join as guest Press # |Security code 1001#. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/24/2021 09:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #12 Motion to Compel. (Court Staff, smh)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley C Sweat on behalf of JMK 3 LLC (Sweat, Bradley)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE OF SHOW CAUSE HEARING: BY TELEPHONE - All parties shall appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call: Toll Free 1-888-398-2342| Access code 3107456. | Join as guest Press # |Security code 1001#. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2021 09:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing filed by Plaintiff JMK 3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Tysse, Holly)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 DEFAULT JUDGMENT by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant The Geneus Group, LLC in the amount of $1,960,147.42 (Court Staff, sbh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Geneus Group, LLC filed by Plaintiff JMK 3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Mistee)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to The Geneus Group, LLC (Court Staff, sjlg)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to The Geneus Group, LLC (Court Staff, sjlg) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/20/2020) (Court Staff, sbh).
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against The Geneus Group LLC by the Clerk of Court, Margaret Botkins (Court Staff, sbh)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default against The Geneus Group LLC filed by Plaintiff JMK 3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Mistee)
January 30, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Amanda L Waesch and Bryan E Meek. Receipt CHY032438. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Amanda L. Waesch and Bryan E. Meek for JMK 3, LLC by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Amanda Waesch; Bryan Meek to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff JMK 3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Mistee)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JMK 3 LLC. The Geneus Group LLC served on 1/16/2020, answer due on 2/6/2020 (Elliott, Mistee)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by JMK 3 LLC: No corporate parent (Elliott, Mistee) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Breach of Contract, Promissory Estoppel and Unjust Enrichment with Jury Demand filed by JMK 3 LLC (1 summons issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY032291) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020: #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JMK 3 LLC v. The Geneus Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMK 3 LLC
Represented By: Holly Lee Tysse
Represented By: Mistee Lyn Elliott
Represented By: Bryan E Meek
Represented By: Amanda L Waesch
Represented By: Bradley C Sweat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Geneus Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?