Best of the West Productions LLC et al v. Cunningham
Plaintiff: Best of the West Productions LLC and Huskemaw Optics LLC
Defendant: Joseph R Cunningham, III
Case Number: 2:2020cv00002
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huskemaw Optics LLC, Best of the West Productions LLC. Joseph R Cunningham, III served on 1/23/2020, answer due on 2/13/2020 (Court Staff, sal)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Joseph R Cunningham, III. (Walker, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert John Walker on behalf of Joseph R Cunningham, III (Walker, Robert)
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Matthew Walker on behalf of Joseph R Cunningham, III (Walker, John)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #Chy032322.), filed by Huskemaw Optics LLC, Best of the West Productions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best of the West Productions LLC et al v. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best of the West Productions LLC
Represented By: Brigita Smilga Krisjansons
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Darrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huskemaw Optics LLC
Represented By: Brigita Smilga Krisjansons
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Darrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Cunningham, III
Represented By: Robert John Walker
Represented By: John Matthew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?