Wheeler Machinery Co v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Wheeler Machinery Co
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00012
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wheeler Machinery Co. Ohio Casualty Insurance Company served on 2/12/2020, answer due on 3/4/2020 (Salisbury, James)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Connor L Cantrell on behalf of Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Cantrell, Connor)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wheeler Machinery Co. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 2/11/2020, answer due on 3/3/2020 (Salisbury, James)
February 10, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Scott S Bridge. Receipt CHY032489. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Scott S. Bridge for Wheeler Machinery Co by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Scott S. Bridge to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Wheeler Machinery Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott S. Bridge, #2 Proposed Order)(Salisbury, James)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R Salisbury on behalf of Wheeler Machinery Co (Court Staff, szf)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (two summonses issued) (Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY032473) filed by Wheeler Machinery Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, szf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2020: #2 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ) (Court Staff, szf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler Machinery Co v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wheeler Machinery Co
Represented By: James R Salisbury
Represented By: Scott S Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Connor L Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?