Willingham v. Taurus International Manufacturing Inc et al
Plaintiff: Zachary T Willingham
Defendant: Taurus International Manufacturing Inc and Taurus Holdings Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00059
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
2 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zachary T Willingham. Taurus Holdings Inc 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Taurus International Manufacturing Inc 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020 (Phillips, Gabriel)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RECUSING MAGISTRATE JUDGE by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. All non-dispositive motions will be heard by the Honorable Mark L. Carman. (Court Staff, sjlg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Zachary T Willingham: this case is non-complex (Court Staff, sbh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mel C Orchard, III on behalf of Zachary T Willingham (Court Staff, sbh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Zachary T Willingham (no summons(es) issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY032802) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2020: #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willingham v. Taurus International Manufacturing Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus International Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary T Willingham
Represented By: Mel C Orchard, III
Represented By: Gabriel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?