Westlake v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Kasey Kay Westlake
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00114
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kasey Kay Westlake. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/1/2020, answer due on 8/31/2020. Served through the Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Rhodes, Diana)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Filed incorrectly. Will be refiled by counsel. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kasey Kay Westlake. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/7/2020, answer due on 7/28/2020 (Rhodes, Diana) Modified on 7/14/2020 (Court Staff, sal).
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Filed incorrectly. Will be refiled by counsel. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kasey Kay Westlake. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/1/2020, answer due on 7/23/2020 (Rhodes, Diana) Modified on 7/14/2020 (Court Staff, sal).
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Filed incorrectly. Will be refiled by counsel. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kasey Kay Westlake. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/2/2020, answer due on 7/23/2020 (Rhodes, Diana) Modified on 7/14/2020 (Court Staff, sal).
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Kasey Kay Westlake, 3 issued. (Court Staff, sal)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Judicial Review (summonses issued). (Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY033215) filed by Kasey Kay Westlake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westlake v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey Kay Westlake
Represented By: Diana Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?