Salway v. Norris
Plaintiff: Travis Salway
Defendant: Eric Norris
Case Number: 2:2020cv00115
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Fraser Howard on behalf of Eric Norris (Howard, Peter)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travis Salway. Eric Norris received waiver on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Court Staff, sbh)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) with Jury Demand. (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY033217) filed by Travis Salway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salway v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Norris
Represented By: Peter Fraser Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Salway
Represented By: Scott Mitchel Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?