Craft et al v. State of Wyoming et al
Plaintiff: Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR) and Sabrina Craft
Defendant: Wyoming Department of Health Current Director, Wyoming State Hospital Former Administrator, Wyoming State Hospital Current Administrator, Antoinette Hutcherson, Wyoming Department of Health Former Director, Wyoming State Hospital, Lidia Garcia, Edgar Hernandez-Bautista, Giovanni Cerda, FNP-BC Martha Mueller, Antoinette, Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo, Richard Dunkley, Steve Billman, State of Wyoming, Jennifer Alexander, Bill Rein, Michael Ceballos, Spencer Kimble, PH.D. Sarah J Rogers, RN Sara Young, Xandrea Vrooman, Thomas O Forslund, Wyoming Department of Health, MD David Carrington, Michael Saxton, Paul Mullenax, Bill Sexton, PMHNP-BC James Fleenor, Renata Hurdsman, Wyoming State Hospital Administrator, Wyoming Department of Health Director and Shelby Hutcherson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00146
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mincer, Deborah)
September 18, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF to #34 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendants Jennifer Alexander, Steve Billman, David Carrington, Giovanni Cerda, Richard Dunkley, James Fleenor, Thomas O Forslund, Lidia Garcia, Edgar Hernandez-Bautista, Renata Hurdsman, Antoinette Hutcherson, Spencer Kimble, Paul Mullenax, Sarah J Rogers, Michael Saxton, Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo, Bill Sexton, Xandrea Vrooman, Sara Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Miller, Timothy) Modified link and text on 9/23/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 18, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF re #35 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendants David Carrington, Richard Dunkley, Thomas O Forslund, Paul Mullenax, Sarah J Rogers, Bill Sexton. (Miller, Timothy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY to #37 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendant Martha Mueller. (Collier, Mark) Modified links on 9/16/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 7, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). (Mincer, Deborah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mincer, Deborah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Mincer, Deborah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Carrington, Rogers, Fleenor, Sexton, Young, Vrooman, Billman, Saxton, Garcia, Hernandez-Bautista, Hutcherson, Hurdsman, Schmidt-Arroyo, Alexander, Kimble, and in their individual capacities, Forslund, Dunkley, Mullena filed by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Mincer, Deborah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss party Defendants State of Wyoming, Wyoming Department of Health, Wyoming State Hospital and, in their Official Capacities, Defendants Foslund, Dunkley, Mullenax, Sexton, Ceballos and Rein filed by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mincer, Deborah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss party Ceballos and Rein filed by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mincer, Deborah)
September 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF JOINDER in of #6 Motion to Dismiss, #7 BRIEF in Support by Defendant Giovanni Cerda (Miller, Timothy) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Defendant Giovanni Cerda (Miller, Timothy)
August 27, 2020 Filing 29 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record received from First Judicial District Court (Court Staff, sbh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 28 BRIEF In Support of #27 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Martha Mueller. (Collier, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Martha Mueller. (Collier, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Defendant Martha Mueller (Collier, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark B Collier on behalf of Martha Mueller (Collier, Mark)
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Lee Tysse on behalf of Renata Hurdsman (Tysse, Holly)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Responses due by 9/4/2020. Replies due by 9/18/2020. (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in State Court on 7/24/2020 by Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). Wyoming Department of Health Current Director served on 7/20/2020, answer due on 8/10/2020. (Court Staff, sbh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in State Court on 7/24/2020 by Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). Wyoming Department of Health served on 7/20/2020, answer due on 8/10/2020. (Court Staff, sbh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in State Court on 7/24/2020 by Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). State of Wyoming served on 7/20/2020, answer due on 8/10/2020. (Court Staff, sbh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed in State Court on 6/15/2020 by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR) (Court Staff, sbh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of motion response deadline filed by Plaintiffs Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Mincer, Deborah) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Defendant Wyoming State Hospital re #1 Notice of Removal (Miller, Timothy) Modified text on 8/11/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record (Miller, Timothy)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson regarding #1 Notice of Removal (Certified copy of order mailed to State Court on 8/13/20) (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Copy of Summons and Complaint by Defendant Renata Hurdsman re #1 Notice of Removal (Hunkins-Newton, Amanda)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 APPENDIX re #10 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Carrington, Richard Dunkley, Thomas O Forslund, Paul Mullenax, Sarah J Rogers, Bill Sexton, State of Wyoming, Wyoming Department of Health, Wyoming State Hospital. (Court Staff, szf)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Carrington, Richard Dunkley, Thomas O Forslund, Paul Mullenax, Sarah J Rogers, Bill Sexton. (Court Staff, szf)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Carrington, Richard Dunkley, Thomas O Forslund, Paul Mullenax, Sarah J Rogers, Bill Sexton. (Court Staff, szf)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants State of Wyoming, Wyoming Department of Health, Wyoming State Hospital and, in their Official Capacities, Defendants Foslund, Dunkley, Mullenax, Sexton, Ceballos and Rein filed by Defendants Paul Mullenax, Bill Sexton, State of Wyoming, Wyoming Department of Health, Wyoming Department of Health Current Director, Wyoming Department of Health Former Director, Wyoming State Hospital, Wyoming State Hospital Current Administrator, Wyoming State Hospital Former Administrator. (Court Staff, szf)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party: Defendants Ceballos and Rein filed by Defendants Michael Ceballos, Bill Rein. (Court Staff, szf) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support of #6 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Carrington, Rogers, Fleenor, Sexton, Young, Vrooman, Billman, Saxton, Garcia, Hernandez-Bautista, Hutcherson, Hurdsman, Schmidt-Arroyo, Alexander, Kimble, and in their individual capacities, Forslund, Dunkley, Mullenax and Sexton, filed by Defendants Jennifer Alexander, Steve Billman, David Carrington, Richard Dunkley, James Fleenor, Thomas O Forslund, Lidia Garcia, Edgar Hernandez-Bautista, Renata Hurdsman, Antoinette Hutcherson, Spencer Kimble, Paul Mullenax, Sarah J Rogers, Michael Saxton, Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo, Bill Sexton, Xandrea Vrooman, Sara Young. (Court Staff, szf)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Carrington, Rogers, Fleenor, Sexton, Young, Vrooman, Billman, Saxton, Garcia, Hernandez-Bautista, Hutcherson, Hurdsman, Schmidt-Arroyo, Alexander, Kimble, and in their individual capacities, Forslund, Dunkley, Mullenax and Sexton filed by Defendants Jennifer Alexander, Steve Billman, David Carrington, Richard Dunkley, James Fleenor, Thomas O Forslund, Lidia Garcia, Edgar Hernandez-Bautista, Renata Hurdsman, Antoinette Hutcherson, Spencer Kimble, Paul Mullenax, Sarah J Rogers, Michael Saxton, Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo, Bill Sexton, Xandrea Vrooman, Sara Young. (Court Staff, szf)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maddisen L Gorman on behalf of Jennifer Alexander, Steve Billman, David Carrington, Michael Ceballos, Richard Dunkley, James Fleenor, Thomas O Forslund, Lidia Garcia, Edgar Hernandez-Bautista, Antoinette Hutcherson, Spencer Kimble, Paul Mullenax, Bill Rein, Sarah J Rogers, Michael Saxton, Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo, Bill Sexton, State of Wyoming, Xandrea Vrooman, Wyoming Department of Health, Wyoming Department of Health Current Director, Wyoming Department of Health Former Director, Wyoming State Hospital Current Administrator, Wyoming State Hospital Former Administrator, Sara Young (Court Staff, szf) Modified filers on 8/12/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy A Pauli on behalf of Jennifer Alexander, Steve Billman, David Carrington, Michael Ceballos, Richard Dunkley, James Fleenor, Thomas O Forslund, Lidia Garcia, Edgar Hernandez-Bautista, Antoinette Hutcherson, Spencer Kimble, Paul Mullenax, Bill Rein, Sarah J Rogers, Michael Saxton, Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo, Bill Sexton, State of Wyoming, Xandrea Vrooman, Wyoming Department of Health, Wyoming Department of Health Current Director, Wyoming Department of Health Former Director, Wyoming State Hospital Current Administrator, Wyoming State Hospital Former Administrator, Sara Young (Court Staff, szf) Modified filers on 8/12/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy W Miller on behalf of Jennifer Alexander, Steve Billman, David Carrington, Michael Ceballos, Richard Dunkley, James Fleenor, Thomas O Forslund, Lidia Garcia, Edgar Hernandez-Bautista, Antoinette Hutcherson, Spencer Kimble, Paul Mullenax, Bill Rein, Sarah J Rogers, Michael Saxton, Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo, Bill Sexton, State of Wyoming, Xandrea Vrooman, Wyoming Department of Health, Wyoming Department of Health Current Director, Wyoming Department of Health Former Director, Wyoming State Hospital Current Administrator, Wyoming State Hospital Former Administrator, Sara Young (Court Staff, szf) Modified filers on 8/12/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Robert J Craft, Sabrina Craft, Sabrina Craft (PR) in First Judicial District Court - Laramie County on June 15, 2020. (Court Staff, szf) Modified text on 8/11/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Judicial District - Laramie County, 193-356 filed by Bill Sexton, Spencer Kimble, Antoinette Hutcherson, Steve Billman, Wyoming Department of Health Former Director, Paul Mullenax, Michael Ceballos, Lidia Garcia, James Fleenor, Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo, Wyoming Department of Health, Wyoming State Hospital Former Administrator, Wyoming Department of Health Current Director, Sara Young, Wyoming State Hospital Current Administrator, State of Wyoming, Richard Dunkley, Jennifer Alexander, Michael Saxton, Sarah J Rogers, Thomas O Forslund, David Carrington, Xandrea Vrooman, Edgar Hernandez-Bautista, Bill Rein, Renata Hurdsman (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number CHY033402) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ) (Court Staff, szf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #3 Proposed Removal Order) (Court Staff, szf). Modified filers on 8/11/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craft et al v. State of Wyoming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Department of Health Current Director
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming State Hospital Former Administrator
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming State Hospital Current Administrator
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Hutcherson
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Department of Health Former Director
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming State Hospital
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lidia Garcia
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Hernandez-Bautista
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Cerda
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNP-BC Martha Mueller
Represented By: Mark B Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Schmidt-Arroyo
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dunkley
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Billman
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Alexander
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Rein
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ceballos
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Kimble
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PH.D. Sarah J Rogers
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Sara Young
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xandrea Vrooman
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O Forslund
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Department of Health
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD David Carrington
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Saxton
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mullenax
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Sexton
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMHNP-BC James Fleenor
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renata Hurdsman
Represented By: Amanda Hunkins-Newton
Represented By: Holly Lee Tysse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming State Hospital Administrator
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Department of Health Director
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Hutcherson
Represented By: Maddisen L Gorman
Represented By: Amy A Pauli
Represented By: Timothy W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Craft
Represented By: Deborah Ford Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Craft (PR)
Represented By: Deborah Ford Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Craft
Represented By: Deborah Ford Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?