Allen v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Georgetta Vanessa Allen
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00155
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Georgetta Vanessa Allen. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/2/2020, answer due on 11/2/2020. Served through the United States Attorney, Office of Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney General. (Wicklund, Edward)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OR STATUS REPORT by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Report due by 10/30/2020.(Court Staff, sal)
September 8, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Edward A Wicklund. Receipt CHY033556. (Court Staff, sjk)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #7 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Edward A Wicklund for Georgetta Vanessa Allen (Court Staff, sal)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Georgetta Vanessa Allen (Crocker, Berthenia)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Georgetta Vanessa Allen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Crocker, Berthenia)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Court Staff, sal)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued to United States Attorney's Office (Court Staff, sbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VIII (Court Staff, sbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued to United States Attorney General (Court Staff, sbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Georgetta Vanessa Allen (Court Staff, sbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Georgetta Vanessa Allen (3 summons(es) issued) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgetta Vanessa Allen
Represented By: Berthenia S Crocker
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?