Mitchell v. United States of America
Petitioner: Antoine Mitchell
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00162
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Respondent United States of America. (Healy, Stuart)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time Motion response deadline 9/28/2020.(Court Staff, sal)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time in Which to Respond to Petitioner's 2255 Motion filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Healy, Stuart)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Service of Complaint by Clerk of Court and Requiring Response re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Antoine Mitchell by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Motion response deadline 9/14/2020. Copy of Order mailed to defendant on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Equitable Tolling filed by Petitioner Antoine Mitchell. (Court Staff, sal)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Antoine Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antoine Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Stuart S Healy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?