Lightning Butte Environmental LLC v. B&M Sand and Gravel Inc
Plaintiff: Lightning Butte Environmental LLC
Defendant: B&M Sand and Gravel Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00163
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to B&M Sand and Gravel Inc. filed by Plaintiff Lightning Butte Environmental LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment)(Baer, Jacob)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against Defendant, B&M Sand and Gravel, Inc. by the Clerk of Court, Margaret Botkins. Copy of default mailed to defendant on this date via U.S. mail and certified U.S. mail. (Court Staff, sal)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default against B&M Sand and Gravel, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Lightning Butte Environmental LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jacob J. Baer, #2 Proposed Order Entry for Default)(Baer, Jacob)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lightning Butte Environmental LLC. B&M Sand and Gravel Inc served on 8/27/2020, answer due on 9/17/2020 (Baer, Jacob)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued (Court Staff, sbh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lightning Butte Environmental LLC (1 summons(es) issued) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (Court Staff, stbd).
August 26, 2020 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. Filing Fee was paid with Receipt Number: CAS002470. (Court Staff, stbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightning Butte Environmental LLC v. B&M Sand and Gravel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lightning Butte Environmental LLC
Represented By: Jacob Jeffrey Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&M Sand and Gravel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?