Wright v Devon Energy Production Company LP
Plaintiff: Madeline A Wright and Madeline A Carson
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Case Number: 2:2022cv00213
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 MOTION for John F. Shepherd and Christopher A. Chrisman to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Court Staff, stmo) (Order emailed to PHV counsel) Modified text on 11/22/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
November 22, 2022 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $200 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEES FOR JOHN F SHEPHERD & CHRISTOPHER A CHRISMAN. RECEIPT 2-709. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP, identifying Other Affiliate Devon Energy Corporation, Other Affiliate Devon Energy Corporation (Oklahoma), Other Affiliate DVN Operating Company, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Devon OEI Operating, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Devon OEI Holdings, L.L.C. for Devon Energy Production Company LP.. (Pope, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Pope, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John F. Shepherd and Christopher A. Chrisman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Pope, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Pope on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Pope, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline A Wright. Devon Energy Production Company LP served on 11/1/2002, answer due on 11/22/2002 (Wilson, Ryan)
October 6, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, sal)
October 6, 2022 Filing 7 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Madeline A Wright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons) (Wilson, Ryan)
October 6, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Ryan K Wilson on behalf of Madeline A Wright Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2167252. (Wilson, Ryan)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Reagan E Bradford on behalf of Madeline A Wright (Bradford, Reagan)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #3 First MOTION for Reagan E. Bradford and Ryan K. Wilson to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Madeline A Wright (order emailed to PHV counsel). (Court Staff, stmo)
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Reagan E. Bradford & Ryan K. Wilson to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Madeline A Wright. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Erb, Richard) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced with flattened PDFs on 10/5/2022) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 10/5/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard A Erb, Jr on behalf of Madeline A Wright (Erb, Richard)
October 5, 2022 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR REAGAN E BRADFORD. RECEIPT 2-444. (Court Staff, sjk)
September 30, 2022 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. $402 Filing Fee was paid with Receipt Number: 2-426 (Court Staff, stmo)
September 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (zero summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand. Counsel - payment is due within three calendar days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2120 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001, filed by Madeline A Wright, Madeline A Carson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, stmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v Devon Energy Production Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline A Wright
Represented By: Richard A Erb, Jr
Represented By: Ryan K Wilson
Represented By: Reagan E Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline A Carson
Represented By: Richard A Erb, Jr
Represented By: Reagan E Bradford
Represented By: Ryan K Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?