Pierson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Barbara Pierson and Barbara A Pierson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv00218
Filed: October 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara A Pierson. United States of America served on 11/14/2022, answer due on 1/13/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Attorney's Office Cheyenne served 10-27-2022, #2 Exhibit US DOJ Wash DC served 11-7-22, #3 Exhibit US Attorney's Office Cheyenne served 11-14-22, #4 Exhibit US DOJ Wash DC served 11-21-22, #5 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipts) (Reinan, Jerome) Modified event text and dates on 12/8/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant United States of America filed by Barbara A Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Claims Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - VA's Denial of Claim) (Reinan, Jerome)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued (Court Staff, szf)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Barbara A Pierson (Reinan, Jerome)
October 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Barbara A Pierson against United States of America (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number AWYDC-2173391) Attorney Jerome Mark Reinan added to party Barbara A Pierson(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order Appointing Personal Representative, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Claim Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - VA Response to Notice of Claim) (Reinan, Jerome) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/18/2022) (Court Staff, szf). Modified text on 10/19/2022 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 10/19/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Pierson
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Pierson
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?