Zahmoul v. NBH Bank
Plaintiff: Nadia Zahmoul
Defendant: Bank of Jackson Hole a division of NBH Bank doing business as Bank of Jackson Hole and NBH Bank doing business as Bank of Jackson Hole
Case Number: 2:2022cv00221
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #38 Motion for Extension of Stay. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until 1/10/2023 to complete mediation. See order for further details and deadlines. (Court Staff, sbh)
December 13, 2022 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for One-Week Extension of Stay re #37 Order on Motion to Stay Case filed by Defendant NBH Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gilmer, Zane) Modified text on 12/14/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #36 Motion to Stay Case until 1/3/2023 (Court Staff, sbh)
November 30, 2022 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendant NBH Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gilmer, Zane)
November 23, 2022 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nadia Zahmoul. NBH Bank served on 10/27/2022, answer due on 12/1/2022 (Cornish, Robert) Modified text on 11/29/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
November 21, 2022 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR CHRISTINE HANLEY. RECEIPT 2-695. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has up to and including 12/1/2022 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Court Staff, sjdl)
November 16, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. #5 ) filed by Defendant NBH Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gilmer, Zane) Modified text on 11/17/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #31 Stipulated Motion to Vacate. The hearing set for 11/14/2022 is VACATED. The Court orders the account shall be closed by Defendant immediately. (Court Staff, sbh)
November 11, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION to Vacate Motion for Preliminary Injunction via Stipulated Order filed by Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cornish, Robert) Modified text on 11/14/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #23 Expedited Motion for Supplementary Discovery by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Altering Case Caption by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. The case caption is altered to reflect Defendant NBH Bank's accurate name. (Court Staff, sbh)
November 9, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #23 Motion for Supplementary Discovery filed by Defendant Bank of Jackson Hole. (Gilmer, Zane) Modified text on 11/10/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 9, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filed Lis Pendens in Teton County, WY by Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul (Cornish, Robert)
November 9, 2022 Filing 26 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - EXHIBIT F in reference to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendant Bank of Jackson Hole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G to Response (Transaction History for x2458), #2 Exhibit H to Response (Transaction History for x8909)) (Gilmer, Zane) Modified text on 11/10/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 9, 2022 Filing 25 DISREGARD. Filing error, counsel to refile. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint (Attorney), #5 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul (Cornish, Robert) Modified on 11/9/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #14 Motion for Order. Defendant may file exhibits F, G, and H as non-public when it files its Response. (Court Staff, sjdl)
November 8, 2022 Filing 23 Expedited MOTION for Supplementary Discovery filed by Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul. (Cornish, Robert) Modified text on 11/9/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 8, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION for Order to Restrict Access to Response Exhibits F, G and H filed by Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cornish, Robert)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #20 MOTION for Christine Hanley to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
November 7, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Christine Hanley to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cornish, Robert)
November 7, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Nathaniel Vasquez on behalf of Bank of Jackson Hole (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2182716) (Vasquez, Nathaniel)
November 7, 2022 Filing 18 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. Plaintiff shall respond to #14 Defendant's Motion for Order to Restrict Access to Response Exhibits F, G and H on or before 11/8/22. (Court Staff, sjdl) Modified link and text on 11/8/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #15 MOTION for Nathaniel T. Vasquez to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Bank of Jackson Hole (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Bank of Jackson Hole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (x8660 Account Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (x9057 Account Agreement), #3 Exhibit C (x4797 Account Agreement), #4 Exhibit D (x2458 Account Agreement), #5 Exhibit E (x8909 Account Agreement), #6 Exhibit I (Promissory Note), #7 Exhibit J (Plaintiff Guaranty), #8 Exhibit K (Karim Guaranty)) (Gilmer, Zane) Modified text on 11/9/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Nathaniel T. Vasquez to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Bank of Jackson Hole. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nathaniel T. Vasquez, #2 Proposed Order) (Gilmer, Zane) Modified text on 11/9/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 4, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order to Restrict Access to Response Exhibits F, G and H filed by Defendant Bank of Jackson Hole. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gilmer, Zane) Modified event and text on 11/7/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Parties' Exchange of Pertinent Documents Ahead of Motion Hearing on November 14, 2022 by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Documents to be provided by 11/9/2022. (Court Staff, sbh)
October 31, 2022 Filing 12 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing on #6 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Parties may appear IN-PERSON or VIA ZOOM NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited*** Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2022 at 1:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 11/1/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 31, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Status Conference held on 10/31/2022 (Court Reporter: Melanie Sonntag) (Court Staff, sbh)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: VIA ZOOM - NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Status Conference set for 10/31/2022 at 2:00 PM before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 28, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Bank of Jackson Hole, identifying Corporate Parent National Bank Holdings Corporation for Bank of Jackson Hole. (Gilmer, Zane)
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zane Allen Gilmer on behalf of Bank of Jackson Hole (Gilmer, Zane)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Scheduling of Status Conference and Supplemental Briefing on Jurisdiction by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Plaintiff has until November 1, 2022, to file a supplemental brief and Defendant will have 3 days from the date of Plaintiff's filing to submit a response. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 25, 2022 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 10/26/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Rule 16 PPTC and Request for Hearing Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul (Cornish, Robert) Modified to correct event and docket text on 10/25/2022 (Court Staff, smxb). Modified event and text on 10/26/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Defendant Bank of Jackson Hole filed by Nadia Zahmoul. (Cornish, Robert)
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson with a referral to Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, stmo)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued (Court Staff, stmo)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Rule 16 PPTC and Request for Hearing Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Nadia Zahmoul. (Cornish, Robert) (Main Document 2: removed blank page and replaced on 10/25/2022) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 10/25/2022 (Court Staff, stmo). Modified to terminate motion, per amendment #6 filed on 10/25/22 (Court Staff, smxb). Modified event and text on 10/26/2022 (Court Staff, sjlg).
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Nadia Zahmoul (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number AWYDC-2175707) Attorney Robert Vaughan Cornish, Jr added to party Nadia Zahmoul(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cornish, Robert) Modified text on 10/24/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zahmoul v. NBH Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Zahmoul
Represented By: Robert Vaughan Cornish, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Jackson Hole a division of NBH Bank doing business as Bank of Jackson Hole
Represented By: Zane Allen Gilmer
Represented By: Nathaniel Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBH Bank doing business as Bank of Jackson Hole
Represented By: Nathaniel Vasquez
Represented By: Zane Allen Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?