Peeples v. Shoemaker et al
Plaintiff: Michael Peeples
Defendant: Daniel Shoemaker, J Lazy J Trucking LLC, Lance Dawson and Lessors Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00229
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin denying #6 Motion to Dismiss Case. The Court declines to dismiss the case and finds good cause to extend the 90 day deadline to accomplish service of process. Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 19, 2023, to accomplish effective service of process. It is further ordered that plaintiffs attempted service of process prior to November 21, 2022 are quashed. (Court Staff, sjdl)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Consent to Trial before Magistrate Judge by Lance Dawson, J Lazy J Trucking LLC, Lessors Inc, Michael Peeples, Daniel Shoemaker. (Court Staff, sjlg)
December 5, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by Plaintiff Michael Peeples. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Police Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Proof of Non Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Affidavit October 24, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Proof of Non Service December 1st, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Proof of Non Service October 10, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F Affidavit of Non Service November 14th, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G Waiver of Service Request) (Hinckley, Eric)
December 1, 2022 Filing 11 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin finding as moot #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Alexis Kind never entered an appearance for Defendants and is not a member of the bar for the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming. As such, the Motion is denied as moot. (Court Staff, sjdl)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Alexis N. King filed by Defendants J Lazy J Trucking LLC, Daniel Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal of Alexis N. King)(Worthen, James)
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Regarding #4 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. ANSWER to #2 State Court Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Daniel Shoemaker and J Lazy J Trucking, LLC filed in in Uinta County District Court - Third Judicial District on October 18, 2022. (Court Staff, szf)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Regarding #4 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. JURY DEMAND filed in in Uinta County District Court - Third Judicial District on October 18, 2022. (Worthen, James) Modified text and added link on 11/22/2022 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified docket text on 11/22/2022 (Court Staff, szf).
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Defendants Lance Dawson, Lessors, Inc. in Uinta County District Court - Third Judicial District on November 4, 2022. (Court Staff, szf)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET for Uinta County District Court - Third Judicial District. (Court Staff, szf)
November 18, 2022 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Murphy, Patrick)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by J Lazy J Trucking LLC, Lance Dawson, Daniel Shoemaker, Lessors Inc by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin.(Court Staff, stbd) (cc: Uinta County District Court via U.S. Mail) Modified text to advise Uinta County was mailed a copy of this Order on 11/10/2022 (Court Staff, stbd).
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed on September 14, 2022 in the District Court of Uinta County. (Court Staff, stbd)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Uinta County District Court, 2022-CV-0000311. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS1-52), filed by Lance Dawson, J Lazy J Trucking LLC, Daniel Shoemaker, Lessors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2022: #3 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peeples v. Shoemaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Peeples
Represented By: Eric Hinckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Shoemaker
Represented By: James C Worthen
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Lazy J Trucking LLC
Represented By: James C Worthen
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Dawson
Represented By: James C Worthen
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lessors Inc
Represented By: James C Worthen
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?