Ruth et al v Beartooth Electric Cooperative Inc et al
Plaintiff: William Jerome Ruth and William Jerome Ruth (Ind)
Defendant: Beartooth Electric Cooperative Inc and Asplundh Tree Expert LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00230
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 15 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: BY TELEPHONE - All parties shall appear by telephone through the Court's conference call system. Guests call: 307-735-3644 Conference ID: 275 440 149#. Parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. Under Local Rule 16.1(a)(2) the parties are reminded to file a written Joint Case Management Plan three business days prior to the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference. The Plan form may be located at www.wyd.uscourts.gov/judges-info under Judge Rankin. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, smxb)
December 27, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Consent to Trial before Magistrate Judge by Asplundh Tree Expert LLC, Beartooth Electric Cooperative Inc, William Jerome Ruth, William Jerome Ruth (Ind). (Court Staff, sjlg)
December 19, 2022 FINANCIAL ENTRY: $100 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid (Receipt #2-835) on behalf of A. David Bona. (Court Staff, stmo)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #12 MOTION to appear pro hac vice admitting A. David Bona for defendant Asplundh Tree Expert LLC. Emailed counsel on this date. (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 12/14/2022 (Court Staff, smxb).
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for A. David Bona to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Asplundh Tree Expert LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Ortiz, Scott)
December 13, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Asplundh Tree Expert LLC. (Ortiz, Scott)
December 7, 2022 Filing 10 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 12/13/2022. (Court Staff, sjdl)
December 6, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline to Answer Plaintiff Complaint filed by Defendant Asplundh Tree Expert LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ortiz, Scott)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott E Ortiz on behalf of Asplundh Tree Expert LLC (Ortiz, Scott)
December 1, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Beartooth Electric Cooperative Inc. (Bailey, Henry)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Jerome Ruth, William Jerome Ruth (Ind). Asplundh Tree Expert LLC served on 11/16/2022, answer due on 12/7/2022 (Barker, Kenneth)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Jerome Ruth, William Jerome Ruth (Ind). Beartooth Electric Cooperative Inc served on 11/14/2022, answer due on 12/5/2022 (Barker, Kenneth)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 DISREGARD. Filing error, counsel to refile. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint (Attorney),, #3 Summons Issued by Plaintiffs William Jerome Ruth, William Jerome Ruth (Ind) (Barker, Kenneth) Modified on 11/22/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (Court Staff, stmo)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, stmo) (With approval, Main Document 2 replaced with correct version on 11/8/2022) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 11/8/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Beartooth Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-2183069) Attorney Kenneth E Barker added to party William Jerome Ruth(pty:pla), filed by William Jerome Ruth and William Jerome Ruth (Ind). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barker, Kenneth) (Attachment 1 and 2 flattened and replaced on 11/8/2022) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified filers and text on 11/8/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruth et al v Beartooth Electric Cooperative Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jerome Ruth
Represented By: Ian Sandefer
Represented By: Kenneth E Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jerome Ruth (Ind)
Represented By: Ian Sandefer
Represented By: Kenneth E Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beartooth Electric Cooperative Inc
Represented By: Henry F Bailey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asplundh Tree Expert LLC
Represented By: Scott E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?