HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC v. United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574
Defendant: HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574
Counter Claimant: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574
Case Number: 2:2022cv00254
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF In Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award to #21 Opposition to Petition filed by Petitioner HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Husband, John) Modified link and text on 2/1/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 31, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER to #19 Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC. (Husband, John) Modified text on 2/1/2023 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified docket text on 2/1/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
January 23, 2023 Filing 24 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: VIA ZOOM - NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Status Conference set for 2/16/2023 at 9:30 AM before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. HollyFrontier shall file its reply to Respondent's Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and In Support of Respondent's Counterclaim to Enforce Arbitration Award on or before January 31, 2023. (Court Staff, sjdl)
January 13, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline to Reply to Respondents Brief in Opposition to Petitioners Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and In Support of Respondents Counterclaim to Enforce Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Law, David) Modified text on 1/18/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 10, 2023 Filing 21 OPPOSITION re #1 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Counter Claimant United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574, Respondent United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574. (Cowper, Nathan) Added link on 1/10/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 10, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574. (Cowper, Nathan) Modified text on 1/10/2023 (Court Staff, stmo).
January 10, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC by United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574. (Cowper, Nathan)
January 6, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by David Stanford Law on behalf of HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2206921) (Law, David)
January 5, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by John M Husband on behalf of HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC (Husband, John)
January 3, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR JOHN M HUSBAND. RECEIPT AWYDC-2202700. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #15 MOTION for John M. Husband and David S. Law to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Petitioner HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
January 3, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John M. Husband and David S. Law to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioner HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Laurene)
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC. United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574 served on 12/13/2022, answer due on 1/10/2023 (Rogers, Laurene)
December 22, 2022 Filing 13 Disregard. Filing Error. Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by John M Husband on behalf of HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2202700. (Husband, John) Modified on 12/22/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent has until January 10, 2023, within which to respond to Petitioner's Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award. (Court Staff, sjdl)
December 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition and Brief filed by Respondent United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cowper, Nathan)
December 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Robert Cowper on behalf of United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574 (Cowper, Nathan)
December 12, 2022 Filing 9 DISREGARD - Docketing error. Summons Issued. (Court Staff, skb) Modified on 12/12/2022 (Court Staff, skb).
December 9, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued (Court Staff, sbh)
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 Praecipe for issuance of Summons to Felix Bocanegra, President, United Steelworkers District 11 filed by Petitioner HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Rogers, Laurene)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Presiding Judge) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Referral Judge). (Court Staff, stbd)
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC. Two Corporate Parents: HollyFrontier Corporation and HF Sinclair Corporation. (Rogers, Laurene) Modified text to add corporate parents of LLC on 12/13/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support of #1 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Rogers, Laurene) Modified text on 12/6/2022 (Court Staff, sbh). (Attachments 1-5 flattened and replaced on 12/7/2022) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 12/7/2022 (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text to correct title of filer on 12/13/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award by Petitioner HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC (Rogers, Laurene) Modified text to correct title of filer on 12/13/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD filed by HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC. (Filing fee $402 receipt #AWYDC-2194296) (Attachments: DISREGARD Exhibits. See attachments to #3 Brief. (1) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Summons #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rogers, Laurene) Modified text on 12/6/2022 (Court Staff, stbd). Modified on 12/6/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC v. United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC
Represented By: Laurene S Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union Local 11-574
Represented By: Nathan Robert Cowper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?